Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker and Rose
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a jury commissioner to provide prospective juror information concerning individuals who are not citizens of the United States to the State Board of Elections within 5 days after receiving the information; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to make specified arrangements to receive the information; requiring the State Administrator to retain a list of individuals whose information has been submitted; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0842
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM