Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a special event permit in Washington County; authorizing a holder of a Class 3 winery license or a Class 4 limited winery license in the county to sell beer, wine that is produced by the holder, and liquor for on-premises consumption at specified events; requiring the permit holder, before using the permit, to notify the Board of License Commissioners at least 1 week before an event is to occur; authorizing the license holder to use the permit no more than 60 times in a year; and providing an annual permit fee of $1,000.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0620
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193990/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {193990/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-102, 31-401, 31-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM