Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain design and siting criteria established by the Coast Smart Council to apply only to certain State and local capital projects; extending the date the projects must comply with the criteria to July 1, 2020, and the date certain local jurisdictions must develop a plan to address certain nuisance flooding to October 1, 2020; requiring the Department of Planning, by October 1, 2019, to develop guidelines to assist local jurisdictions in data collection to establish nuisance flooding baselines; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Stein) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-28)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Stein) Adopted (136-0) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 47
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
Text - Third - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-28) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Text - Chapter - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001, 3-1006, 3-1009, 3-1018 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM