Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Hydraulic Elevator Inspections - Privately Owned Buildings
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing a certain type of hydraulic elevator in a privately owned building from a requirement for a certain test; requiring that, beginning October 1, 2022, a certain annual test on a certain type of hydraulic elevator in a privately owned building be performed by a licensed elevator mechanic in the presence of a third-party qualified elevator inspector; altering a certain date to October 1, 2021, on which certain elevator inspections are required to begin; and requiring the Secretary of Labor to make certain reports.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Safety - Hydraulic Elevator Inspections - Privately Owned Buildings
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 10:10 AM