Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 to add an additional grantee to specified grants.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714265/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714265/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Text - Chapter - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM