Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "crime of violence" to remove an exception for the use of a firearm in the commission of a certain offense of possession with intent to distribute a controlled dangerous substance.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/12/2019
Legislative Date
8/12/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/12/2019 8/12/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM