Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the use of certain vehicle height monitoring systems in Baltimore County to enforce certain State and local laws restricting the presence of certain vehicles during certain times; and applying to Baltimore County certain provisions of law relating to vehicle height monitoring systems.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0050
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/23/2019
Legislative Date
8/23/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/23/2019 8/23/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 9:53 AM