Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-11)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to require members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City, at the rank of captain or above, to reside in Baltimore City; and providing that a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore shall apply prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {658671/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970516/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Branch) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-11)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore City - At-Will Supervisory Members of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {658671/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {970516/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Branch) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (125-11) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-1, 16-2A )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page