Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer maintenance injectable medications to a patient under certain circumstances; prohibiting a pharmacist from administering a maintenance injectable medication unless the pharmacist provides the patient with a notice concerning certain financial information; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2022, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations establishing standard procedures; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0135
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744831/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {744831/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page