Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain Consumer Price Index used for calculating the target per pupil foundation amount and the student transportation amount for education; and altering certain references to the Consumer Price Index for the Washington-Baltimore Metropolitan Area in the Annotated Code to refer to the Consumer Price Index for the Washington Metropolitan Area.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0042
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {929832/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {929832/1 Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Text - Third - State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 33
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Returned Passed 43
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Text - Chapter - State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 5-205 )
(   15-847 )
(   9-101, 9-638, 9-638.1 )
(   14-101, 16-209, 16-402 )
(   11-135, 11B-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM