Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using telephone facilities, data files, or equipment to make calls or send data intended to annoy, abuse, torment, or harass a public safety answering point or public safety agency; prohibiting a person from using telephone facilities, data files, or equipment to make calls or send data to a public safety answering point or a public safety agency with the intent to trigger an emergency response or impair certain functions; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0837 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/04/2020
Legislative Date
8/04/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/04/2020 8/04/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/21/2021 3:09 PM