Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsored by
Senator Peters (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that regular interest may not be paid on member contributions of specified members of the Judges' Retirement System under specified circumstances; providing that an individual who was a member of the Judges Retirement System on or before June 30, 2012, is separated from employment for more than 4 years, and returns to employment in a position that requires membership in the Judge's Retirement System is subject to specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0077
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159732/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284560/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {159732/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Appropriations 33
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {284560/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 58
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-101, 27-203, 27-204, 27-401, 27-402, 27-405, 27-406, 29-501, 29-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM