Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, to provide certified doula services including childbirth education and support services and emotional and physical support provided during pregnancy, labor, birth, and postpartum; authorizing the Secretary of Health to contract with certified doulas for the provision of care under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 1:52 PM