Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, King, Peters, Salling, Serafini, Zucker, and Carozza
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for materials, parts, and equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or the avionics systems of aircraft if the materials, parts, or equipment are installed on the aircraft; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly by December 31 each year on the amount of sales and use tax revenue lost from the exemption and any change to the number of aviation technicians employed in the State as a result of the exemption; terminating the Act after June 30, 2025; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0016
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0002 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/05/2019
Legislative Date
8/05/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {689931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {363627/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/05/2019 8/05/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments {689931/1 Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Floor Amendment {363627/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 10
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Referred Ways and Means 11
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 12:36 PM