Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, Eighty-Nine Million, One Hundred Ninety-Four Thousand Dollars ($1,089,194,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, June 1, 2020, June 1, 2021, June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM