Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Augustine, and Benson
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum civil penalty applicable to a violation for affixing a commercial sign to a State highway sign, signal, or marker in the State highway right-of-way to $100 per commercial sign affixed; and clarifying certain language establishing a civil penalty for a violation of the prohibition against placing or maintaining commercial signs in a State highway right-of-way.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-2)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Reassigned to Finance 3
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {417977/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 25
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 26
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-2) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:45 AM