Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0148 - 2020RS
   CH0005 - 2021RS
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving the acquisition of certain real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 unless the Board has provided the Legislative Policy Committee with certain information; prohibiting the Board from approving the acquisition of real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 from the federal government until the Board provides a certain notice and, on a certain request, a study assessing the ongoing fiscal impact the acquisition would have on the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0125
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884637/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Overridden (30-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (96-39)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {884637/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Overridden (30-15)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (96-39)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page