Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, following the discovery of a check to a decedent or the estate of a decedent payable for a sum not exceeding $1,000 after the estate is closed and the appointment of the personal representative is terminated, to enter an order authorizing a certain interested person to indorse and deposit the check into the interested person's bank account for the limited purpose of distributing the funds in a certain manner; providing that a hearing is not required before a court may enter a certain order; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448776/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {448776/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judiciary 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 11:05 AM