Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to provide training to certain Executive Branch agencies on the preparation of certain economic impact analyses; requiring a promulgating unit to establish an electronic registry that allows any small business, nonprofit organization, or other interested party to receive electronic notification when a proposed regulation is posted and to provide an opportunity for comments if the proposed regulation will have a significant small business impact; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0157
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884036/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {884036/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-501 through 3-508 )
(   10-101, 10-110, 10-224, 2-1505.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM