Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain requirement that a life insurer include, in a certain manner, a certain statement on an application or an endorsement for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor to allow the life insurer to include the statement on a certain disclosure; and applying the Act to policies of life insurance on the life of a minor issued or delivered in the State on or after January 1, 2020.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0193
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 34
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 58
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM