Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment
Sponsored by
Senators Shank and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a State Senator to delegate to the Secretary of State the Senator's authority to approve an applicant for notary public; authorizing the Governor to appoint and commission, under specified circumstances, an individual as a notary public on approval by the Secretary; and requiring an application for notary public, under specified circumstances, to bear or be accompanied by the written approval of the Secretary.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0448
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0169 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {103128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {103128/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 25
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM