Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a distribution from a perpetual care trust fund to be used for certain purposes; permitting a certain cemetery to select a certain method of distribution from a certain perpetual care trust fund; requiring the cemetery to submit a certain statement to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight if the cemetery selects a certain method of distribution from the perpetual care trust fund; requiring the Director to make a certain report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2027; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0005
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0483 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/06/2020
Legislative Date
8/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/06/2020 8/06/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:50 PM
Click to return on the top page