Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Senators Glassman, Jacobs, and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Harford County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights; providing that specified provisions of law relating to hearing board procedures and the finality of specified hearing board decisions do not apply in Harford County; and defining terms.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0346
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 28
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Appropriations 33
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1001, 11-1002, 11-1008, 11-1009 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM