Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special or Supplemental Needs Trusts - Authorization to Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law concerning regulations adopted by specified State agencies regarding special or supplemental needs trusts may not be interpreted to require a court order to authorize the funding of a special or supplemental needs trust.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43A
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14.5-1002 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM