Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to strengthen access to health care by developing a process to complement existing licensing and provide a streamlined method to allow physicians to become licensed in multiple states; requiring the State Board of Physicians to set fees for issuance and renewal of licenses under the Compact; requiring a compact physician to submit certain information to the Board within 30 days after receiving the request from the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0596
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {846481/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {834932/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {846481/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text - Chapter - Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
(   14-101, 14-313.1, 14-316, 14-3A-01, 14-3A-02, 14-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page