Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the person authorized to make a foreclosure sale to give written notice of the proposed sale to a specified condominium or homeowners association that, at least 30 days before the date of the proposed sale, has recorded a statement of lien against the property; requiring the trustee, within 14 days after the postponement or cancellation of a foreclosure sale, to send a notice that the sale was postponed or canceled to the record owner; applying the Act to a foreclosure sale scheduled after the effective date of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {203122/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Floor Amendment {203122/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 39
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM