Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Lam, Peters, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, West, Augustine, Benson, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Griffith, Hester, Klausmeier, Miller, Patterson, Smith, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application requirements for a service member, veteran, or military spouse to apply for an occupational or professional license from a unit in the Maryland Department of Labor to require submission of proof that the applicant has held a certain license from another state for at least 1 year; authorizing the issuance of a temporary license to certain individuals who have held a valid license from another state for less than 1 year provided that the license is in good standing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {284634/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 11:49 AM