Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "major transportation project"; requiring the Department to develop a model that uses a specified project-based scoring system to rank specified projects and to make the model available to the public; requiring the Department to use the model to rank specified projects; requiring the Department to include specified rankings and scores in an appendix to the Consolidated Transportation Program and on the Department's Web site; establishing the Workgroup on the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {849036/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {849036/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {983727/1 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713728/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584664/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal)
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {849036/1 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 43
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {849036/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {983727/1 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {713728/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Appropriations Environment and Transportation 48
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {584664/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text - Chapter - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM