Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain provision of law requiring a campaign finance entity to terminate and file a final campaign finance report applies; altering the time period within which a certain campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a final campaign finance report; requiring the State Board of Elections to provide a certain notification to certain persons affiliated with a campaign finance entity that is required to terminate under a certain provision of law; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0199 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:25 PM