Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the type of position of specified personnel in the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission; establishing specified personnel positions in the Commission as contractual positions; and establishing that the Director of the Commission is the immediate supervisor of the General Counsel, Treasurer or Chief Financial Officer, Chief Engineer, and any other department director.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0679
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Adopted 27
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Second Reading Passed 27
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 32
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM