Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Hours of Sale
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing hours of sale for a holder of a Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license from 9 a.m. to 9 p.m. along the north side of Frederick Avenue between South Augusta Avenue and South Loudon Avenue in Baltimore City.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883795/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883795/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Hours of Sale
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Hours of Sale
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {883795/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {883795/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page