Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring public school employers in all jurisdictions of the State to negotiate with employee organizations designated as the exclusive representatives for the public school employees a requirement of a service or representation fee to be charged to nonmembers; providing a specified exception and requirement for specified noncertificated employees whose religious beliefs are opposed to joining or financially supporting a collective bargaining organization; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0667
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487370/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-41)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (99-41) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-407, 6-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM