Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications would be described as being in the skilled service or the professional service; providing certain requirements for employees hired beginning July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0678 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Reassigned to Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-41) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
(   2-104, 2-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page