Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Hayes, Kelley, Smith, and Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 184
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment to be the greater of 75% of the disposable wages due or 30 times the State minimum hourly wage in effect at the time the wages are due, multiplied by the number of weeks during which the wages due were earned; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0365
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333094/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (117-15)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-33)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 184
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {557970/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {333094/1 Adopted 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (117-15) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (97-33) 51
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 184
Text - Chapter - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/29/2020 5:30 PM