Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsored by
Senators West and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 293
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an October 1, 2020, effective date of certain articles of incorporation filed with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for record; authorizing the articles to contain a delayed effective date, not later than 30 days after the Department accepts the articles for record; authorizing indemnification of a board of directors by a certain vote of certain directors or by a certain vote of a committee of the board; providing that certain stockholders' rights of inspection do not apply to certain corporations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0668
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 293
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {408570/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Economic Matters 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 293
Text - Chapter - Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
(   2-102, 2-104, 2-406, 2-408, 2-418, 2-513, 2-604, 3-104, 3-105, 3-109, 3-403, 3-903, 5-202, 8-101, 8-205, 8-601.1, 8-703 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page