Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "contagious disease or virus" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the notification of a possible exposure of certain emergency services personnel to include 2019-nCoV; extending certain notification requirements regarding possible exposure to a contagious disease or virus to certain emergency medical services clinicians; requiring that certain emergency medical services clinicians receive certain training and certain equipment; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0737
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page