Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Training Commission to adopt a set of standards for the training and deployment of SWAT teams in the State; requiring each law enforcement agency to follow the standards; requiring, on or before April 1, 2017, and on or before April 1 of each following year a law enforcement agency that maintains a SWAT team to report specified information to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention using a specified format; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801 through 3-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM