Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Guzzone, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to increase or add Executive Department items in the budget bill, subject to a specified limitation; providing for the veto of specified budget bill items; providing for the reversion to original appropriations of specified vetoed items in the budget bill; authorizing the General Assembly to override budget bill item vetoes; establishing the manner in which and the time at which budget bill items become law; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters for adoption or rejection.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0837 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/10/2015 Text - First - State Budget
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM