Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates and Associate's Degrees - Tuition Waiver
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Community College Vocational Certificate and Associate's Degree Tuition Waiver Program; exempting individuals from the payment of tuition to attend community colleges for which a county has elected to participate in the Program; requiring an individual to pay tuition if the individual does not earn a 2.0 or earns below a "c" grade or its equivalent; requiring the Governor annually to include an appropriation for the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1620
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM