Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland to review the need for additional funding, training, and other resources necessary to increase diversity and inclusion in the tourism industry in the State; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1541
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1387 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 9:37 AM