Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that members of the Wicomico County Board of Education be elected and appointed, as specified; providing for a student member of the county board; establishing the composition of the county board; providing for the qualifications, terms of office, and the filling of a vacancy for the members of the county board; establishing removal, hearing, and appeal procedures for members of the county board; submitting the Act to the legally qualified voters of Wicomico County for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/13/2015 Text - First - Wicomico County - Board of Education
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-105, 3-114, 3-13A-01 through 3-13A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM