Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to provide a certain inmate with a reentry kit that includes clothing, an identification card, contact information on reentry services, information on Medicaid and the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, and transportation; providing that a person who uses a firearm in the commission of a crime of violence is guilty of a felony and establishing certain penalties; prohibiting a dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a regulated firearm under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0035 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {648272/1
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {648272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted (26-18)
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {648272/1 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {648272/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Carter) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted (26-18) 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page