Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, Miller, and Muse
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to install an outdoor synthetic turf field at each public high school in the county beginning in fiscal year 2016 through the end of fiscal year 2020; requiring specified fields to be constructed for joint use; prohibiting aggregate expenditures using funds from Program Open Space from exceeding 50% of the total amount authorized for development projects in Prince George's County for any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0597
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {979230/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {979230/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Appropriations 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-131 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM