Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Hayes, Hershey, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ticket reseller from selling or offering to sell speculative tickets unless the reseller makes certain disclosures; and requiring a reseller to refund a certain deposit or other consideration within 10 days after the event for which the tickets were sold under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {837878/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-310, 13-310.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM