Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the University of Maryland Joint Steering Council to be the MPowering Joint Steering Council; requiring the Council to explore opportunities to create registered apprenticeship programs in nursing and other fields; requiring the Governor to include a certain appropriation in the annual State budget for the Council and the University of Maryland Baltimore County; requiring the appropriation to be used as supplemental to funding that otherwise would be appropriated for the Council and the University; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University of Maryland Joint Steering Council - Renaming and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159139/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {914163/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - University of Maryland Joint Steering Council - Renaming and Funding
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {159139/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 49
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {914163/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Text - Chapter - University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-301, 12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM