Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Eckardt, and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue a seasonal exceptional poultry hauling permit that authorizes specified axle configurations and specified increased weight limits while carrying live poultry from a farm to a processing facility from November 1 until April 30 annually in specified counties; requiring, before October 1 each year, each specified poultry processing facility to submit to the Administration a complete list of registered combinations of vehicles used for carrying live poultry; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0768
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0573 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {470813/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {270317/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load and Exceptional Hauling Permit - Poultry
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load and Exceptional Hauling Permit - Poultry
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 39
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {470813/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {270317/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-113.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM