Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsored by
Chair, Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County, on or before June 30, 2020, to enter into an agreement with the owner of a specified economic development project that provides a specified economic benefit for a payment in lieu of the county real and personal property tax; authorizing the owner of the economic development project and the county to modify the payment in lieu of taxes agreement entered into on or before June 30, 2020, under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0695
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {459835/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {459835/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Ways and Means 47
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM