Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "elevated level of lead" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring the periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public and nonpublic school buildings; and requiring by August 1, 2021, a school to take certain remedial measures on a drinking water outlet tested on or before June 1, 2020, if the test indicated a concentration of lead that was more than 5 parts per billion but less than 20 parts per billion.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {404338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833022/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {404338/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Floor Amendment {833022/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:20 PM