Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Exemption - Worldwide Headquartered Company Election
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain worldwide headquartered company, if the company's parent corporation is a franchisor, to employ at the parent corporation's principal executive office in the State at least 400 full-time employees at all times between July 1, 2017, and June 30, 2020, in order to elect to use a certain formula to apportion certain income to the State for purposes of the income tax on corporations; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Exemption - Worldwide Headquartered Company Election
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM