Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - School Construction
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Kittleman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to 75% or more the percentage of State money that must be used in an elementary or a secondary school construction project before the Prevailing Wage Law applies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0667 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-201, 17-210, 17-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM